Mathematics
Grade-4-
Easy

Question

Use rounding to estimate:
37 x 41

  1. 40 x 40 = 1600
  2. 30 x 40 = 1200
  3. 35 x 50 = 1750
  4. 20 x 20 = 400

Hint:

Rounding off the numbers and multiplying them

The correct answer is: 40 x 40 = 1600


    37 x 41
    37 is rounding to 40.
    41 is rounding to 40.
    40 x 40 = 1600.

    Related Questions to study

    card img

    With Turito Academy.

    card img

    With Turito Foundation.

    card img

    Get an Expert Advice From Turito.

    Turito Academy

    card img

    With Turito Academy.

    Test Prep

    card img

    With Turito Foundation.